The Board of Trustees of the Firefighter's Relief Fund administers the Firefighter's Relief Fund, and is responsible for providing for aid to sick or injured firefighters, dependents of deceased firefighters, and destitute firefighters who have had five years of service. Funds are derived from a tax on fire insurance premiums. The Board is established under and regulated by Articles 84 to 88 of Chapter 58 of the General Statutes.
Board Information
The Board is composed of five members, two of whom are elected by members of the Fire Department, one of whom is appointed by the State Commissioner of Insurance, and two of whom are appointed by the Council to serve at the pleasure of the governing body. If the Fire Chief is not appointed as a member of the Board, he/she serves ex officio, but has no vote. Members hold office until their successors are appointed and qualified with no term limits imposed. They serve without compensation.
Special meetings of the Board may be called by the Chairperson. Notice shall be given verbally or in writing and delivered personally to each member or left at his residence not less than forty-eight hours prior to the time of the meeting; provided, that the minimum time period for notice to a member may be waived by such member if he/she is present at the special meeting.
The Board must also cause written notice of the special meeting, stating its general purpose, to be posted at the door of its meeting place, to be mailed or delivered to each news media, and/or person(s) who has filed a request for notice with the City Clerk's office, at least forty-eight hours before the special meeting.
The Board elects a Chairperson, a secretary, and a treasurer from among its members. One person may be both secretary and treasurer, and the treasurer must be bonded.
Name | Position | Term Start | Term End | Status | Appointed By |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faulk, Daniel | Board Member | 01 Jan 2010 | 31 Dec 2059 | Active | |
Forbis, John | Chair | 01 Jan 1994 | 01 Jan 2050 | Active | Insurance Commissioner |
Hinson, Michael | Board Member | 06 Dec 2016 | 05 Dec 2066 | Active | Hightower |
Robinson, Jim | Staff Liaison | 01 Feb 1997 | 31 Jan 2047 | Active | |
Rudd, Tifanie | Board Member | 18 Dec 2018 | 17 Dec 2068 | Active | Wells |
Trexler, Michael | Board Member | 01 Jan 2017 | 31 Dec 2066 | Active |